MD HB486 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland to act on behalf of the University System of Maryland and certain system institutions for the purpose of collective bargaining; altering the application of certain collective bargaining requirements to certain employees by requiring the State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board to make certain determinations; providing for the negotiation of a certain consolidated memorandum of understanding; etc.
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB9 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB641 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
HB641 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Federal Government
Higher Education
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Federal Government
Higher Education
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 12 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 2A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0486?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0486f.pdf |