MD HB478 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a procurement officer in the Department of General Services or the Department of Transportation to use qualification based selection as a method of procuring land surveying services; and applying certain parameters, standards, and requirements of qualification based selection to land surveying services.
Title
Procurement - Qualification Based Selection - Land Surveying Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Communications
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Evidence
Fines
General Services, Department of
Jurisdiction
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Surveyors
Transportation, Department of
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Evidence
Fines
General Services, Department of
Jurisdiction
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Surveyors
Transportation, Department of