MD HB465 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing collective bargaining rights for specified family child care providers who participate in the Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program; authorizing providers to designate an exclusive representative; requiring specified procedures to be governed by provisions of collective bargaining law for State employees; etc.
Title
Collective Negotiations by Family Child Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (26-18) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Senators Garagiola, Astle, and Klausmeier | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-17) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (100-39) | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Delegates Davis, Braveboy, and Manno | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (101-39) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Jennings) Rejected (42-89) | |
2010-03-21 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-89) | |
2010-03-21 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Sossi) Rejected (43-91) | |
2010-03-21 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Benson) Adopted | |
2010-03-21 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Sossi) | |
2010-03-19 | Special Order 3/23 (Delegate Sossi) Adopted | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Child Care
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Elections
Fees
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Elections
Fees
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment