MD HB457 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the exemption from the recordation tax for a purchase money mortgage or purchase money deed of trust applies only to the extent that the purchase money mortgage or purchase money deed of trust secures purchase money.
Title
Recordation Tax - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust - Extent of Exemption
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Embry [D] | Del. Marlon Amprey [D] | Del. Adrian Boafo [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] |
Del. Shaneka Henson [D] | Del. Aaron Kaufman [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB65 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 12 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |