MD HB453 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law governing the Elderly Rental Housing Program, the Nonprofit Rehabilitation Program, and the Rental Housing Production Program and establishing a new Rental Housing Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; consolidating loan programs within the Department into a single program; providing for types of financing and repayment terms; establishing uses for loan proceeds; clarifying standards for multifamily loans; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2014-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-19 | House | Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {670817/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Economic and Community Development
Elderly Persons
Home Improvement
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Construction
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Economic and Community Development
Elderly Persons
Home Improvement
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Loans
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations