MD HB451 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a member of the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board may petition the circuit court to order certain entities to comply with an order from the Board; establishing that the failure to meet an established negotiation deadline is an unfair labor practice for certain entities under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-48) (Y: 86 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (90-49)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {417474/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-05SenateHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-03SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-03-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (85-48)
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {474961/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0451&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0451f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0451t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0451e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_814_hb0451e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0451_47496101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0451_41747401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0451.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0451_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0822.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0451_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1474.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1333.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback