MD HB440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system for purposes of net energy metering; increasing the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system from 2 megawatts to 5 megawatts; and specifying that a community solar energy generating system is not a generating station if the generating capacity of the community solar energy generating system does not exceed 2 megawatts.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-40) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573329/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB110 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-21 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Construction
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Insurance
Liability
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Solar Energy
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Insurance
Liability
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Solar Energy
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |