MD SB110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system from 2 megawatts to 5 megawatts.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Generating Capacity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB440 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0110?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0110f.pdf |