MD HB394 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1194

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-12SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18SenateHearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-16SenateHearing canceled
2021-03-10SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-11HouseThird Reading Passed (130-6)
2021-02-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-04HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-21HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1194 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback