MD HB1194 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB394
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.
Title
Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695161/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1194 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs