MD HB392 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB396

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education, by January 1, 2022, to establish guidelines for early childhood developmental screenings for children under the age of 3 years to be used by certain family child care homes or child care centers to assess a child's developmental progress and screen for potential disabilities; requiring, beginning July 1, 2022, certain family child care homes or child care centers to offer to parents or guardians evaluations for children entering these homes or centers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (115-15)
2021-02-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {985961/1 Adopted
2021-02-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-07-08HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB396 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5310.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education5413.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback