MD HB392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB826
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors of a condominium shall take before a penalty for a violation of the condominium's rules can be imposed on an alleged violator; establishing procedures a board of directors or other governing body of a homeowners association shall take before a penalty for a violation of the homeowners association's rules can be imposed; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain associations; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Special Order until 02/27 (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {100813/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB392 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Condominiums
Contracts
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Time
Condominiums
Contracts
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Time