MD HB826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB615
Note: Carry Over of previous HB392
Note: Carry Over of previous HB392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors of a condominium shall take before a penalty for a violation of the rules of the condominium can be imposed on an alleged violator; altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors shall take if an alleged violator does not comply with a certain written demand to cease and desist in a certain period of time; etc.
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB826 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB392 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
HB392 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Communications
Condominiums
Ethics
Evidence
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time
Witnesses
Condominiums
Ethics
Evidence
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 111.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |