MD HB390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves certain population centers along the I-270 corridor and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department, in conducting the study, to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to study and make recommendations to the Governor and certain Committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {420619/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB390 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
SB548 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB548 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
Examinations
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prices
Reports
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
Examinations
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prices
Reports
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of