MD HB116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB390
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves population centers along the I-270 corridor in Frederick and Montgomery Counties and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to study and make recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Transportation ā Iā270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-07-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB242 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB390 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
HB390 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Boundaries
Buses
Communications
Commuters
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Reports
Ridesharing
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Buses
Communications
Commuters
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Reports
Ridesharing
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0116?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0116f.pdf |