MD HB380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination of a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to costs incurred with respect to a principal residence; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback