MD HB378 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund to authorize grants from the Fund to be made for projects that reduce conflicts between black bears and humans; renaming the Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund to be the Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund; increasing the amount of reimbursement from the Fund per person annually authorized for damage caused by black bears to not less than $5,000; requiring the Governor to include at least $50,000 in the annual budget bill for the Fund; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund - Uses
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243429/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB310 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Damages
Farmland
Forests and Parks
Grants
Higher Education
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Animals
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Damages
Farmland
Forests and Parks
Grants
Higher Education
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |