MD HB374 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting business personal property from the property tax imposed by a county or municipal corporation, subject to certain exceptions; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify certain provisions of law and submit a certain report to the General Assembly; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsors
Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Bob Flanagan [R] |
Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] |
Del. Michael Malone [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Tony McConkey [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] |
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
Del. Deb Rey [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] | Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] |
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Commerce and Business
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property