MD HB362 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duty of an employee organization recognized as the exclusive representative of certain employees of the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to represent all employees, including law enforcement personnel, in a certain bargaining unit fairly and without discrimination; authorizing the exclusive representative to require an employee who does not pay certain dues or fees to pay certain costs and fees for filing a certain grievance or arbitrating a certain matter; etc.
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {334664/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Arbitration
Attorneys' Fees
Bi-County Agencies
Collective Bargaining
Fees
Forms
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Arbitration
Attorneys' Fees
Bi-County Agencies
Collective Bargaining
Fees
Forms
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Time
Work, Labor and Employment