MD HB354 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the director of a corporation must act in good faith, in a manner the director reasonably believes to be in the best interests of the corporation, and with the care that an ordinarily prudent person in a similar position would use under similar circumstances; clarifying that a director who acts in accordance with a specified provision of law shall have specified immunity from liability; etc.
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793692/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Ethics
Liability
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities
Work, Labor and Employment
Corporations and Associations
Ethics
Liability
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities
Work, Labor and Employment