MD HB352 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board; requiring that at least 80% of the Board's members reflect the geographic diversity of the State and have a background in advocacy for certain ethnic and social groups; requiring the Advisory Board to review academic standards for American studies and develop a model policy on ethnic and social equity in public schools; requiring each county board of education to implement a curriculum for American studies before the 2025-2026 school year; etc.
Title
Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] |
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB888 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-10 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Historical Matters
Minorities
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Religion
Reports
Sexual Orientation
Students
Sunset
Women
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Historical Matters
Minorities
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Religion
Reports
Sexual Orientation
Students
Sunset
Women
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0352?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0352f.pdf |