MD HB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB29
Note: Carry Over of previous HB38
Note: Carry Over of previous HB38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration, under certain circumstances, suspend the registration of a motor vehicle that incurs a certain toll violation; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB346 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB38 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB435 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-25 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB38 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB435 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-25 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Citations
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Fees
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Citations
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Fees
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |