MD HB344 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring State agencies in the Executive Branch and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites an agenda and all meeting materials at least 48 hours in advance of each open meeting or, under certain circumstances, as far in advance of the meeting as practicable; requiring State agencies and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites live video or audio streaming of each portion of a certain meeting, and a certain recording for a minimum of 1 year after the date of the meeting; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Meetings Act – Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseHearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
2021-02-09HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-23HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2020-10-08HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB72 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development10604(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10607(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2102(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions3302.1(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions3306(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions3401(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2108(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation4201(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation4212(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback