MD HB335 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of provisions of law governing grievance procedures for certain State employees; requiring a grievant to complete certain forms in sufficient detail that will allow for the expeditious resolution of the grievance; and applying a certain definition of "grievance" to a certain requirement that the Department of Transportation adopt certain regulations relating to employee grievance procedures.
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-45) (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-21) (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-21) (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-45) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {877377/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-21) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {913929/1 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {434960/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Discipline
Discrimination
Forms
Mediation
Notices
Personal Representatives
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Forms
Mediation
Notices
Personal Representatives
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment