MD HB328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing restrictions on holding an election in a building used, owned, or occupied by an establishment that holds an alcoholic beverages license; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations regarding the use of a building or part of a building that is owned, occupied, or partially occupied by an establishment that holds an alcoholic beverages license as a polling place; and requiring certain regulations to prioritize the placement of polling places in a facility not owned by the holder of an alcoholic beverage license.
Title
Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373029/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823227/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB907 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Boundaries
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |