MD HB327 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Council for the Procurement of Health, Education, and Social Services to establish a workgroup to determine a process for specified entities to submit specified electronic documents to specified agencies; requiring the Council to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Title
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic Form
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {756482/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Privacy
Privatization
Procurement
Public Employees
Records
Social Services
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Privacy
Privatization
Procurement
Public Employees
Records
Social Services
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology