MD HB318 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to increase by a certain amount certain funding to certain recipients of services funded through the Developmental Disabilities Administration under certain circumstances; requiring the Developmental Disabilities Administration to provide certain recipients of services certain options and services under certain circumstances; establishing the State Advisory Council on Self-Directed Services; etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-24 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Budgets
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Personal Representatives
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agents and Brokers
Budgets
Caregivers
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Personal Representatives
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |