MD HB314 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB209

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2022, a certain retail establishment from distributing plastic carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; providing that, on or after July 1, 2022, only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of certain plastic bags by a retail establishment, that certain authority of a county or municipality is preempted, and that certain laws or ordinances are superseded; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic Bag Reduction Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Floor Amendment 853724/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 90 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (97-37)
2021-03-10HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
2021-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-05HouseFloor Amendment {853724/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (36-90)
2021-03-04HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McKay) Adopted
2021-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {970013/1 Adopted
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-11HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2020-09-08HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB223 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
HB209 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Favorable Report by Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation19106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback