MD HB209 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Favorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2021, a certain retail establishment from distributing plastic carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; providing that, on or after July 1, 2021, only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of certain plastic bags by a retail establishment, that certain authority of a county or municipality is preempted, and that certain laws or ordinances are superseded; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic Bag Reduction Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-13SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (95-37)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11HouseFloor Amendment {683623/1 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseMotion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {530619/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB313 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation19106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback