MD SB223 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB313

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2022, a certain retail establishment from distributing plastic carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; providing that, on or after July 1, 2022, only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of certain plastic bags by a retail establishment, that certain authority of a county or municipality is preempted, and that certain laws or ordinances are superseded; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic Bag Reduction Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-09-08SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB314 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Referred Finance
SB313 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation19106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback