MD HB312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to allow deer hunting on specified Sundays does not apply in Kent County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on Sundays in Kent County throughout all deer hunting seasons, subject to specified provisions of law and specified time restrictions.
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-4) (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-5) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-5) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-4) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {694633/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-5) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |