MD HB299 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB457
Note: Carry Over of previous HB131
Note: Carry Over of previous HB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a system to track the chain of custody of synthetic turf installed on sports and playing fields in the State; requiring the custodian of a synthetic turf sports or playing field installed in the State to report chain of custody information to the Department by January 1, 2024, or within 30 days after the installation whichever is later; and requiring the Department to serve as the custodian for chain of custody information and develop and maintain a website with certain information.
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf - Chain of Custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-31) |
2023-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263723/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB299 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB131 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB131 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contractors
Environment
Environment, Department of the
internet
Maps and Charts
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Time
Weights and Measures
Contractors
Environment
Environment, Department of the
internet
Maps and Charts
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |