MD HB457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a producer or seller of synthetic turf to disclose to a customer typical maintenance practices and costs for removing, replacing, and disposing of synthetic turf; and requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with representatives of the industry, local environmental and community stakeholders, and synthetic turf producers, retailers, and users, to conduct a study on the synthetic turf industry in the State and report its findings to certain committees of the General Assembly by July 1, 2026.
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf - Disclosure and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-31) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573323/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573323/1 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-38) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813424/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB299 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Construction
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Copyright
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Forms
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Prices
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Weights and Measures
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Copyright
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Forms
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Prices
Procurement
Public Information
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |