MD HB296 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board, the Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board, the Apprenticeship and Training Council, and the Board of Boiler Rules in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2024 the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the boards and council; repealing the termination provision for the Division of Labor and Industry; etc.
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Amusement Parks and Carnivals
Apprentices
Attorney General
Boilers and Pressure Vessels
Bonds
Business Regulation and Occupations
Citations
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Fines
Fraud
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Mediation
Minors
Notices
Occupational Safety
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Safety
Salaries
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Amusement Parks and Carnivals
Apprentices
Attorney General
Boilers and Pressure Vessels
Bonds
Business Regulation and Occupations
Citations
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Fines
Fraud
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Mediation
Minors
Notices
Occupational Safety
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Safety
Salaries
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment