MD HB286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including law enforcement officers and first responders within the scope of certain prohibitions against committing certain crimes against certain persons, damaging certain property of certain persons, burning certain objects, and damaging certain buildings with which certain persons or groups have contacts or associations or under circumstances exhibiting certain animosity against a certain person or group; providing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Hate Crimes – Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsors
Del. Wayne Hartman [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB99 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Arson
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Threats
Vandalism
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Threats
Vandalism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0286?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0286f.pdf |