MD HB270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - First Reading Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing collective bargaining rights to certain graduate assistants at certain public institutions of higher education; establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for certain graduate assistants; and altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-42) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (94-42)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback