MD HB268 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations that require graduation from a specified program by a minority business enterprise that provides architectural and engineering services if the financial viability of the minority business enterprise exceeds $6,000,000; and altering the definition of small business under the Small Business Reserve Program by increasing a specified maximum average gross sales requirement for architectural and engineering services.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program and Small Business Reserve Program -
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] | Del. Craig Rice [D] | Del. Herman Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0268.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0268f.pdf |