MD HB267 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a private passenger automobile insurer to use data obtained through telematics from a specific vehicle only for establishing an insurance premium for a policy that insures that vehicle if the named insured consents to the data collection for claims investigation purposes including fraud, or for rate filing purposes using aggregated telematics data; authorizing an insurer to sell or exchange for other consideration certain aggregated telematics data only under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Telematics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-42) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333197/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Fraud
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Other than Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Names
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Claims
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Fees
Fraud
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Other than Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Names
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology