MD HB264 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain person that generates food residuals to separate the food residuals from other solid waste and ensure that the food residuals are diverted from final disposal in a refuse disposal system in a certain manner; applying the requirements of the Act to certain persons that generate certain amounts of food residuals; authorizing a person experiencing undue hardship because of the costs of diverting food residuals to apply for a certain waiver; requiring the Department of the Environment to issue a certain warning; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 823120/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
2021-04-01HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (94-41)
2021-04-01HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {134031/1 Adopted
2021-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-19SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (97-40)
2021-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2021-03-17HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Boyce) Adopted
2021-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke)
2021-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {823120/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (46-90)
2021-03-16HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {890612/1 Adopted
2021-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-08-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB483 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91701(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91724.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0264?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0264f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0264t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0264e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_439_hb0264e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0264_89061201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0264_82312001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0264_95342901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0264_13403101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0264_ent.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0264_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0483.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0561.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0958.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0772.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback