MD SB483 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain person that generates food residuals to separate the food residuals from other solid waste and ensure that the food residuals are diverted from final disposal in a refuse disposal system in a certain manner; applying the requirements of the Act to certain persons that generate certain amounts of food residuals; authorizing a person experiencing undue hardship because of the costs of diverting food residuals to apply for a certain waiver; requiring the Department of the Environment to issue a certain warning; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (95-40)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {640111/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-22HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {324433/1 Adopted
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-22SenateHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB264 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91701(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91724.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0483?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0483f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0483t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0483e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_440_sb0483e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0483_32443301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0483_64011101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0483_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0483_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0659.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1124.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0971.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback