MD HB257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling house of disabled veterans with a service-connected disability rating of at least 50%; providing for the amount of the property tax credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documentation; authorizing certain governing bodies to provide the credit to a certain surviving spouse; applying the Act to tax years after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Property Tax – Credit for Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Del. Brian Crosby [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629 |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {239833/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {875764/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB417 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Subjects
Counties
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |