MD HB248 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removing rape and certain sexual offenses from the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a certain respondent against a certain victim for which a peace order petition may be filed under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "person eligible for relief" for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to domestic violence protective orders to include an individual who alleges the commission of certain acts against the individual by a certain respondent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (123-8)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (27-18)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {798471/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {798471/1
2020-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-21SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (122-17)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-01-21HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB210 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 133

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings31503(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law4501(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback