MD HB248 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class B-R (restaurant) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license, a Class B-RB (restaurant/bar) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license, a Class B-T (tavern) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license, a Class B-N (nightclub) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license, and a Class B-H (hotel) on-sale beer, wine and liquor license in Charles County; authorizing the Charles County Board of License Commissioners to issue specified licenses; establishing conditions for the issuance of licenses; etc.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Fees
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Fees
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations