MD HB24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to adopt regulations establishing criteria for the timing of the winter application of sewage sludge that are the same as or substantially similar to the criteria adopted for the timing of the winter application of animal manure; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Title
Agriculture - Sewage Sludge - Timing of Winter Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (138-2) | |
2011-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-03 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) Rejected | |
2011-03-02 | Special Order until 3/3 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters |