MD HB230 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of the Howard County ethics law; clarifying a definition; making specified persons subject to the ethics law under specified circumstances; altering provisions governing the preparation of a report about affidavits and disclosures filed by persons, as specified; requiring that specified summary reports be made available for immediate inspection by the public; etc.
Title
Howard County Ethics Law - Clarifications and Enhancements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Environmental Matters |