MD HB223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on dwellings that are owned by certain eligible teachers; providing for the maximum amount of the credit; requiring the Prince George's County government to submit a certain report concerning the credit to certain persons on or before a certain date; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783920/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Teachers
Laws and Ordinances
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Teachers