MD HB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers from the State Department of Education to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission to provide staff support for the Council; authorizing the Commission to seek the assistance of organizations with expertise in school-based health care or specified other matters to provide additional staffing resources to the Commission and the Council; etc.
Title
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Public Schools
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Public Schools