MD HB219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB937
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain formulary developed by the Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and adopted by the State Board of Physicians to include certain prescription drugs and devices; authorizing a licensed naturopathic doctor to dispense, order, or administer certain natural medicines in a certain manner; authorizing a licensed naturopathic doctor to prescribe, dispense, and administer certain prescription drugs and medical foods in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Council Membership, Formulary Content, and Scope of Practice
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB937 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 5F-04.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5F-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0219?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0219f.pdf |