MD HB217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "community association" and "local code violation" for purposes of certain provisions of law authorizing community associations to seek judicial relief for nuisance abatement in Baltimore County; repealing a provision of law requiring a certain court to determine in what amount and under what conditions a bond must be filed by a community association in a certain nuisance action; including in the definition of "community association" an association that represents two or more individual community associations; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {300119/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Bonds
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Leases and Rent
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property
Bonds
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Leases and Rent
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property