MD HB214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim of qualifying criminal activity or the victim's parent, guardian, or next friend to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification under certain circumstances; providing the certifying entity must certify or decline certification of the form within 90 days of receiving a certain request; providing that a certifying entity or official is immune from certain criminal or civil liability; etc.
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-25) (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-23) (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-25) (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-23) (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422 |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-25) |
2019-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378173/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-23) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {803422/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted |
2019-03-08 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {602811/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Certifications
Commission on Civil Rights
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Ethics
Human Services, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Public Officials
Records
State's Attorneys
Victims
Witnesses
Certifications
Commission on Civil Rights
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Ethics
Human Services, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Petitions
Public Officials
Records
State's Attorneys
Victims
Witnesses